House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 6 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Rader |