House | 04/10/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Talley | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Stanley |