House | 04/04/2023 | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Duel (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Pugh |