House | 04/05/2023 | CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Tourism | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Williams | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Boren | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) |