House | 04/04/2023 | Remove Representative Hardin as principal House author and substitute with Representative Boatman | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |