House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Montgomery |