Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/31/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 8
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative ODonnell
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
Conference granted, naming Special Conference Committee on SB 473
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2024
|
SCs named Treat, McCortney, Gollihare, Howard, Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Hilbert
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2024
|
remove as principal author Representative Hilbert and substitute with Representative Echols
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Paxton; authored by Senator Treat
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 26
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Sneed, Manger, West (Kevin), Cantrell
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Withdrawn from General Government, Direct to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|