Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/06/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Boles, Manger, Roberts, Baker
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Sneed, Burns, Davis, Newton, McEntire, Williams, Cantrell, McCall, Bennett, Hilbert, Stark, Randleman, Marti, Roe, Tedford, Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Stinson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Fugate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|