House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Montgomery |