Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB600 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 23, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023