Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/25/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Remove Representative Pfeiffer as principal House author and substitute with Representative Fetgatter
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rader
|
|
|