House | 04/13/2023 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Rader |