Senate | 04/24/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/23/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Montgomery |