Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB68 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023