Senate | 05/01/2023 | Approved by Governor 05/01/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 9 | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Dobrinski (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Pederson |