Senate | 02/28/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Hays (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Committee amendment adopted | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Burns | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Murdock | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |