Senate | 05/01/2024 | Approved by Governor 05/01/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Rosino |