Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB724 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023