Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB729 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2024
Bill March 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2024

Amended

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill February 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2024