Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/22/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Tedford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 8
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Hall
|
|
|