Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB742 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023

Amended

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023