Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Approved by Governor 06/14/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
SCs changed Burns, Coleman, Hicks, Jett, Rosino, Thompson (Kristen), Weaver to Paxton, Rosino, Coleman, Thompson (Kristen), Burns, Weaver, Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
remove as principal author Representative Hilbert and substitute with Representative Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Rosino; authored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Rosino, Coleman, Thompson (Kristen), Burns, Weaver, Hicks, Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|