Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB77 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 28, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023