Senate | 04/28/2023 | Approved by Governor 04/28/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Coleman |