Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB8 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 29, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 14, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023