Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB841 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2023