Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB844 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2023