Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Green
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
SCs named Dahm, Paxton, Green, Jett, Dossett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|