Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB907 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023