Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB913 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023