House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Jech |