House | 04/11/2023 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Stephens | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Bullard |