Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB984 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023