Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB991 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2024

Amended

Bill March 25, 2024
Bill February 15, 2023