Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SJR17 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44 Req. No. 859 Page 1 1
55 2
66 3
77 4
88 5
99 6
1010 7
1111 8
1212 9
1313 10
1414 11
1515 12
1616 13
1717 14
1818 15
1919 16
2020 17
2121 18
2222 19
2323 20
2424 21
2525 22
2626 23
2727 24
2828 1
2929 2
3030 3
3131 4
3232 5
3333 6
3434 7
3535 8
3636 9
3737 10
3838 11
3939 12
4040 13
4141 14
4242 15
4343 16
4444 17
4545 18
4646 19
4747 20
4848 21
4949 22
5050 23
5151 24
5252
5353 STATE OF OKLAHOMA
5454
5555 1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023)
5656
5757 SENATE JOINT
5858 RESOLUTION 17 By: Newhouse
5959
6060
6161
6262
6363 AS INTRODUCED
6464
6565 A Joint Resolution calling a Constitutional
6666 Convention to modernize, update, or amend the present
6767 Constitution of the State o f Oklahoma or to propose a
6868 new Constitution; fixing the time and place thereof;
6969 providing for selection of delegates to the
7070 Convention; directing certain members of the
7171 Legislature and the Governor to form a committee to
7272 select certain delegates; providing date of
7373 adjournment; providing for submission of
7474 constitutional changes to the voters of the state;
7575 providing for submission of this joint resolution to
7676 a vote of the people; ordering a special election;
7777 providing ballot title; and directing filing .
7878
7979
8080
8181
8282
8383 WHEREAS, Section 2 of Article XXIV of the Oklahoma Constitution
8484 requires that a proposal to hold a Constitutional Convention sh all
8585 be submitted to a vote of the people at least once every twenty (20)
8686 years; and
8787 WHEREAS, the last proposal providing for a Constitutional
8888 Convention was submitted to a vote of the people March 17, 1970; and
8989 WHEREAS, a State Question to eliminate the re quirement that a
9090 Constitutional Convention proposal be submitted to the people every
9191
9292
9393 Req. No. 859 Page 2 1
9494 2
9595 3
9696 4
9797 5
9898 6
9999 7
100100 8
101101 9
102102 10
103103 11
104104 12
105105 13
106106 14
107107 15
108108 16
109109 17
110110 18
111111 19
112112 20
113113 21
114114 22
115115 23
116116 24
117117 1
118118 2
119119 3
120120 4
121121 5
122122 6
123123 7
124124 8
125125 9
126126 10
127127 11
128128 12
129129 13
130130 14
131131 15
132132 16
133133 17
134134 18
135135 19
136136 20
137137 21
138138 22
139139 23
140140 24
141141
142142 twenty (20) years was defeated at th e General Election held November
143143 8, 1994; and
144144 WHEREAS, the current Constitution is the sec ond longest in the
145145 United States and contains many references to antiquated industries,
146146 provisions, and terms to b e removed or updated; and
147147 WHEREAS, it is incumbent u pon the Legislature to enact a law
148148 providing for a Constitutional Convention and to sub mit the law to a
149149 vote of the people.
150150 NOW, THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED BY THE SENATE AND THE HOUSE OF
151151 REPRESENTATIVES OF THE 1ST SESSION OF THE 59TH OKLAHOMA LEGISLATURE:
152152 SECTION 1. The Secretary of State shall refer to the people for
153153 their approval or rejection, as and in the manner provided by law,
154154 the question, pursuant specifically to Section 2 of Artic le XXIV of
155155 the Oklahoma Constitution, of calling a C onstitutional Convention
156156 for the purpose of modernizing, updating, or amending the current
157157 Constitution, or to propose a new Constitution for this state.
158158 SECTION 2. The Constitutional Con vention shall convene not
159159 later than twelve o’clock noon, September 12, 2024, in Oklahoma City
160160 at the State Capitol.
161161 SECTION 3. The President Pro Tempore of the Senate, the Speak er
162162 of the House of Representatives, the Minority Leader of the Senate,
163163 the Minority leader of the House of Representatives, and the
164164 Governor, shall form a committee to determine and select the
165165 delegates to participate in the Con stitutional Convention.
166166
167167
168168 Req. No. 859 Page 3 1
169169 2
170170 3
171171 4
172172 5
173173 6
174174 7
175175 8
176176 9
177177 10
178178 11
179179 12
180180 13
181181 14
182182 15
183183 16
184184 17
185185 18
186186 19
187187 20
188188 21
189189 22
190190 23
191191 24
192192 1
193193 2
194194 3
195195 4
196196 5
197197 6
198198 7
199199 8
200200 9
201201 10
202202 11
203203 12
204204 13
205205 14
206206 15
207207 16
208208 17
209209 18
210210 19
211211 20
212212 21
213213 22
214214 23
215215 24
216216
217217 SECTION 4. The Constitutional Convention shall adjourn sine die
218218 no later than June 30, 2025.
219219 SECTION 5. A special election is hereby ordered to be held
220220 throughout this state on or before March 5, 2024, at which time the
221221 proposed Constitutional Convention, as set forth in SECTION 1 of
222222 this resolution, shall be submitted to the people of Oklahoma for
223223 their approval or rejection as and in the manner provided by law.
224224 SECTION 6. The Ballot Title for the proposed question to be put
225225 before the people as provided herein shall be in the following form:
226226 BALLOT TITLE
227227 Legislative Referendum No. ____ State Question No. ____
228228 THE GIST OF THE PROPOSITION IS AS FOLLOWS:
229229 This measure calls a state Co nstitutional Convention. It would
230230 begin on September 12, 2024. It would end by June 30, 2025. It
231231 would review the State Cons titution. It could alter, amend, or
232232 revise the Constitution. It could propose a new State
233233 Constitution. Any change in the Constitu tion or new
234234 Constitution must be presented for approval to state vot ers.
235235 This would happen at the General Electio n in 2026.
236236 SHALL THE PROPOSAL BE APPROVED?
237237 FOR THE PROPOSAL — YES _____________
238238 AGAINST THE PROPOSAL — NO _____________
239239
240240
241241 Req. No. 859 Page 4 1
242242 2
243243 3
244244 4
245245 5
246246 6
247247 7
248248 8
249249 9
250250 10
251251 11
252252 12
253253 13
254254 14
255255 15
256256 16
257257 17
258258 18
259259 19
260260 20
261261 21
262262 22
263263 23
264264 24
265265 1
266266 2
267267 3
268268 4
269269 5
270270 6
271271 7
272272 8
273273 9
274274 10
275275 11
276276 12
277277 13
278278 14
279279 15
280280 16
281281 17
282282 18
283283 19
284284 20
285285 21
286286 22
287287 23
288288 24
289289
290290 SECTION 7. The President Pro Tempore of the Senate shall
291291 immediately after the passage of this resolution, prepare and file
292292 one copy thereof, including the Ballot Title set forth in SECTION 6
293293 hereof, with the Secretary of State and one copy with the Attorney
294294 General.
295295
296296 59-1-859 KR 1/19/2023 2:21:02 PM