House
|
04/18/2024
|
Motion expired
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 60
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin), Kane
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Prieto
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|