House | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Representative McCane | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | First Reading |