Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Provenzano
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Banning
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Bennett
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Burns, Menz, Munson
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Commerce and Economic Development Oversight Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak, Hays, Osburn
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Policy recommendation to the Commerce and Economic Development Oversight committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Referred to Business
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Commerce and Economic Development Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Authored by Representative Bashore
|
|
|