Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Townley
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 13
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Amendment to strike title rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Third Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Woolley
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 61 Nays: 12
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Hildebrant
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Adams
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Authored by Senator Gillespie (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Policy recommendation to the Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Authored by Representative Hildebrant
|
|
|