House
|
04/23/2025
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Authored by Representative Lawson
|
|
|