Senate | 04/23/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 21 | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Amended | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | General Order | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Authored by Senator Frix (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight Committee | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Emergency removed | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Policy recommendation to the Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Representative Kerbs |