Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Gise
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Authored by Representative Pae
|
|
|