Oklahoma 2025 2025 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2019 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/24/2025

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2019 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
April 23, 2025 
AS AMENDED 
 
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 2019 	By: Pae and Gise of the House 
 
  and 
 
  Pugh of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
[ revenue and taxation - aerospace industry tax 
credit - effective date ] 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE S TATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 2021, Section 2357.302, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 2357.302.  A.  Except as provided in subsection F of 
this section, for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2008, 
and ending before January 1, 2026 2032, a qualified employer shall 
be allowed a credit against the tax imposed pursuant to Section 2355 
of this title for tuition reimbursed to a qualified employee. 
B.  The credit authorized by subsection A of this section may be 
claimed only if the qualified employee has been awarded an 
undergraduate or graduate degree within one (1) year of commencing 
employment with the qualified employer. 
C.  The credit authorized by subsection A of this section shall 
be in the amount of fifty percent (50%) of the tuition reimbursed to   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2019 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
a qualified employee for the first through fourth years of 
employment.  In no event shall this credit exceed fifty percent 
(50%) of the average annual amount paid b y a qualified employee for 
enrollment and instruction in a qualified program at a public 
institution in Oklahoma. 
D.  The credit authorized by subsection A of this section shall 
not be used to reduce the tax liability of the qualified employer to 
less than zero (0). 
E.  No credit authorized by th is section shall be claimed after 
the fourth year of employment. 
F.  No credit otherwise authorized by the provisions of this 
section may be claimed for any event, transaction, investment, 
expenditure or other act o ccurring on or after July 1, 2010, for 
which the credit would otherwise be allowable.  The provisions of 
this subsection shall cease to be operative on July 1, 2011.  
Beginning July 1, 2011, the credit authorized by this section may be 
claimed for any event, transaction, investment, expenditure o r other 
act occurring on or after July 1, 2011, according to the provisions 
of this section. 
SECTION 2.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 2021, Section 2357.303, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 2357.303.  A.  Except as provided in subsect ion F of 
this section, for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2008, 
and ending before January 1, 2026 2032, a qualified employer shall   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2019 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
be allowed a credit against the tax imposed pursuant to Section 2355 
of this title for compensation paid to a qua lified employee. 
B.  The credit authorized by subsection A of this section shall 
be in the amount of: 
1.  Ten percent (10%) of the compensation paid for the first 
through fifth years of employment in the aerospace s ector if the 
qualified employee graduated from an institution located in this 
state; or 
2.  Five percent (5%) of the compensation paid for the first 
through fifth years of employment in the aerospace sector if the 
qualified employee graduated from an institution located outside 
this state. 
C.  The credit authorized by this section shall not exceed 
Twelve Thousand Five Hundred Dollars ($12,500.00) for each qualified 
employee annually. 
D.  The credit authorized by this section shall not be used to 
reduce the tax liability of the qualified employer t o less than zero 
(0). 
E.  No credit authorized pursuant to this section shall be 
claimed after the fifth year of employment. 
F.  No credit otherwise authorized by the provisions of this 
section may be claimed for any event, transaction, investment, 
expenditure or other act occurring on or after July 1, 2010, for 
which the credit would otherwise be allowable.  The provisions of   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2019 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
this subsection shall cease to be operative on July 1, 2011.  
Beginning July 1, 2011, the c redit authorized by this section may be 
claimed for any event, transaction, investment, expenditure or other 
act occurring on or after July 1, 2011, according to the provisions 
of this section. 
SECTION 3.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 2021, Section 2357.304, as 
amended by Section 2 , Chapter 313, O.S.L. 2024 (68 O.S. Supp. 2024, 
Section 2357.304), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 2357.304.  A.  Except as provided in subsection D of 
this section, for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2008, 
and ending before January 1, 2026 2032, a qualified employee shall 
be allowed a credit against the tax imposed pursuant to Section 2355 
of this title of up to Five Thousand Dollars ($5,000.00) per tax 
year for a period of time not to exceed five (5) years during the 
lifetime of the qualified employee.  This credit may be claimed in 
nonconsecutive tax years. 
B.  The credit authorized by this section shall not be used to 
reduce the tax liability of the taxpayer to less than zero (0). 
C.  Any credit claimed, but not used, may be carried ov er, in 
order, to each of the five (5) subsequent taxable years. 
D.  No credit otherwise authorized by the provisions of this 
section may be claimed for any event, transaction, investment, 
expenditure or other act occurring on or after July 1, 2010, for 
which the credit would otherwise be allowable.  The provisions of   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2019 SFLR 	Page 5 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
this subsection shall cease to be operative on July 1, 2011.  
Beginning July 1, 2011, the credit authorized by this section may be 
claimed for any event , transaction, investment, expenditure or other 
act occurring on or after July 1, 2011, according to the provisions 
of this section. 
SECTION 4.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2025. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS 
April 23, 2025 - DO PASS AS AMENDED