House | 02/24/2025 | Remove Representative Luttrell as principal House author and substitute with Representative May | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Referred to Energy | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Referred to Energy and Natural Resources Oversight | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Remove Representative Pfeiffer as principal House author and substitute with Representative Luttrell | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | First Reading |