Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Revenue and Taxation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Revenue and Taxation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 27
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Frix
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Harris, Bashore, Pfeiffer, Hill, Deck
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Menz, Munson, Alonso-Sandoval
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Authored by Representative Miller
|
|
|