Senate | 04/17/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Government Resources committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Government Resources | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Amended | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | General Order | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Oversight Committee | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Policy recommendation to the Government Oversight committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Referred to General Government | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Referred to Government Oversight | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Representative Hilbert |