House
|
05/01/2025
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator Nice
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator Goodwin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Schreiber, Munson, Deck
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Policy recommendation to the Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight committee; Do Pass Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Authored by Representative Hill
|
|
|