Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Revenue and Taxation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Revenue and Taxation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2025
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Authored by Representative Harris
|
|
|