House | 04/21/2025 | Filed with Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Adopted, returned to House | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Direct to Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Kirt | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Considered | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Adopted, referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Coauthored by all other Representatives | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Authored by Senator Frix (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Authored by Representative West (Rick), Bennett | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Introduced |