House | 04/17/2025 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight Committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Policy recommendation to the Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight committee; Do Pass Public Safety | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Deevers | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Coauthored by Senator McIntosh | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Senator Daniels |